EP0167301 - Filter medium and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORIGIN COMPANY LIMITED 1266-1, Naeki Nakatsugawa-shi Gifu-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states ORIGIN COMPANY LIMITED 1266-1, Naeki Nakatsugawa-shi Gifu-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wada, Yoneji 2-1324 Takashimadaira 2-32 Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304010.3 | 05.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | JP19840117293 | 07.06.1984 Original published format: JP 11729384 | JP19840120138 | 12.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12013884 | JP19840237754 | 12.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23775484 | [1986/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167301 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167301 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
B01J20/28026 (EP,US);
B01D39/14 (KR);
B01D29/111 (EP,US);
B01D29/216 (EP,US);
B01D35/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Filtermaterial und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1986/02] | English: | Filter medium and method of manufacturing the same | [1986/02] | French: | Matériau de filtre et méthode de sa fabrication | [1986/02] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 12.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/24] | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3762127 (COCHRAN T, et al); | [A]EP0034994 (VALLOUREC [FR]); | [A]DE3221212 (BOFORS AB [SE]) |