EP0165048 - Railway track circuit equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.L. ENGINEERING (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED M.L. Building 644 Ajax Avenue Trading Estate Slough SL1 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states M.L. ENGINEERING (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED M.L. Building 644 Ajax Avenue Trading Estate Slough SL1 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cross, Peter John 55 Southway Lane Roborough Nr. Plymouth Devon / GB | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1986/32] | Blatchford, William Michael Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1986/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1985/51] | Stephens, Michael John M.J. Stephens & Co. 46 Tavistock Place Plymouth PL4 8AX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304144.0 | 12.06.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | GB19840015025 | 13.06.1984 Original published format: GB 8415025 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165048 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165048 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B61L23/16 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
B61L1/188 (EP);
B61L23/168 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/51] | Title | German: | Eisenbahnspurschaltungsausrüstung | [1985/51] | English: | Railway track circuit equipment | [1985/51] | French: | Equipement de circuits pour voie ferrée | [1985/51] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1996 | Examination procedure | 01.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/17] | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.1987 | 30.06.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 24.09.1985 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 22.04.1986 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3526278 (SCOTT LYLE B); | [X]US3829682 (GEIGER W); | [X]US3666217 (SIBLEY HENRY C); | [E]GB2159311 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL) |