Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0169672

EP0169672 - Method for producing transgenic animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Revocation of patentpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]For all designated states
THE PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Former [1986/05]For all designated states
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
University Place, 4th floor South, 124 Mt. Aubern Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Leder, Philip
25 Aston Road
Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02167 / US
02 / Stewart, Timothy A.
3867 25th Street
San Francisco California 94114 / US
[1986/05]
Representative(s)Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 J J Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1990/23]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [1986/05]Bizley, Richard Edward
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date85304490.724.06.1985
[1986/05]
Priority number, dateUS1984062377422.06.1984         Original published format: US 623774
[1986/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0169672
Date:29.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0169672
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1985
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/85, G01N33/574, A01K67/027
[1992/20]
Former International [1986/05]C12N15/00, G01N33/574
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Schaffung genetisch manipulierter Tiere[1986/05]
English:Method for producing transgenic animals[1986/05]
French:Méthode pour la production d'animaux transgéniques[1986/05]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure10.05.1986Examination requested  [1986/28]
20.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
29.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.1989Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.11.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.11.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.1991Fee for grant paid
21.11.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
British Union for the Abolition of Vivisection
16a Crane Grove
LONDON N7 8NN / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Ökologisch - Demokratische Partei
Bohnesmühlgasse 5
97070 Würzburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Pietruk, Claus Peter
Patentanwalt
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Liegsalzstrasse 36 Rückgebäude
D-80339 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk e.V.
Bgm.-Haide-Str. 38
86473 Ziemetshausen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/27]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
British Union for the Abolition of Vivisection
16a Crane Grove
LONDON N7 8NN / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Ökologisch - Demokratische Partei
Bohnesmühlgasse 5
97070 Würzburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk e.V.
Bgm.-Haide-Str. 38
86473 Ziemetshausen / DE
Former [2004/04]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
British Union for the Abolition of Vivisection
16a Crane Grove
LONDON N7 8NN / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Ökologisch - Demokratische Partei
Bohnesmühlgasse 5
97070 Würzburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Former [2004/03]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
British Union for the Abolition of Vivisection
16a Crane Grove
LONDON N7 8NN / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Ökologisch - Demokratische Partei
Bohnesmühlgasse 5
97070 Würzburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2001/44]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Ökologisch - Demokratische Partei
Bohnesmühlgasse 5
97070 Würzburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2001/24]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland
Berghausener Strasse 10
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  19.04.2000  WITHDRAWN
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1996/14]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1996/10]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1996/05]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1995/52]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1995/48]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1995/43]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters; et al
Charles House, 5A Charles Street
Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1995/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming Supporters
Charles House, 5a Charles Street
Petersfield Hants. GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1995/38]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming
Charles House, 5a Charles St.
Petersfield Hants. GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fraktion Bündnis 90/ DIE GRÜNEN im Bayer. Landtag
Maximilianäum
81627 München / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1993/49]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming
Charles House, 5a Charles St.
Petersfield Hants. GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Schindler, Wolfgang
Wessobrunnerstrasse 33
81377 München / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993  24.06.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1993/31]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993  24.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Compassion in World Farming
Charles House, 5a Charles St.
Petersfield Hants. GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
 08  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993  21.04.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993  31.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
 17  05.02.1993   
Deutsches Tierhilfswerk
Waldmeisterstr. 95b
8000 München 45 / DE
Opponent's representative
Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr.
Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1993/19]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993   
Compassion in World Farming
Charles House, 5a Charles St.
Petersfield Hants. GU32 3EH / GB
 02  07.02.1993   
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
 03  06.02.1993  23.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  13.02.1992  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
 08  14.02.1993   
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993   
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993   
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993   
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993   
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993   
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993   
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
Former [1993/17]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993   
British union for the abolition of vivisection
16a Crane Grove
London N7 8LB / GB
 02  07.02.1993   
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
 03  06.02.1993   
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993   
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  13.02.1992   
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993   
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993   
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
 08  14.02.1993   
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993   
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993   
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993   
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 12  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Keine Patente auf Leben
Koordinationsstelle Schweiz,Postfach 18
4461 Böckten / CH
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 13  14.02.1993  09.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Hamberger Sylvia et al; "Kein Patent auf Leben"
Frohschamerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993   
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993   
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993   
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
Former [1993/15]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993   
British union for the abolition of vivisection
16a Crane Grove
London N7 8LB / GB
 02  07.02.1993   
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
 03  06.02.1993   
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993   
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  13.02.1992   
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993   
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993   
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
 08  14.02.1993   
Evangelischer Stadtkirchenverband Köln
Kartäusergasse 9
D-50678 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr.
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 09  14.02.1993   
Bundesland Hessen vertr. durch das Hessische Ministerium für Jugend, Familie und Gesundheit
Dostojewskistr. 4
D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 10  14.02.1993   
Koechlin F., Schenkelaars P. et al. "No Patents on Life"
29 Rue Blanch
1050 Brüssel / BE
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 11  14.02.1993   
Voggenhuber J. et al. Grüner Klub im Parlament
Schenkenstr. 8-10
1017 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 14  14.02.1993   
Bundeszentrale der Tierversuchsgegner Österreichs
Radetzkystr.21
1030 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 15  14.02.1993   
Wiener Tierschutzverein und Zentralverband der Tierschutzvereine Österreichs
Khlesplatz 6
1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
 16  15.02.1993   
Helletsberger H.
Waldwiesenstr. 8d
D-81375 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kern, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73
D-81369 München / DE
Former [1993/14]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993   
British union for the abolition of vivisection
16a Crane Grove
London N7 8LB / GB
 02  07.02.1993   
Bundesverband der Tierversuchsgegner et al
Postfach 170110
D-53027 Bonn / DE
 03  06.02.1993   
Oekologische Demokratische Partei
Clemens-August-Str. 75a
D-53115 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Speitel 102
D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE
 04  15.02.1993   
Büchner Reinhard
Im Steininger 3
73035 Göppingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Salgo, Reinhold Caspar, Dr.
Patentanwalt Toebelistrasse 88
CH-8635 Duernten / CH
 05  13.02.1992   
Meinel A. et al; Fraktion Bündnis 90
Holländische Strasse
D-01067 Dresden / DE
 06  13.02.1993   
Fuchs U. et al
Kaiser Wilhelm Ring 19
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 07  12.02.1993   
Paulig R. et al Fraktion Die Grünen im Bayrischen Landtag
Maximilianeum
8000 München 85 / DE
Former [1993/11]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.1993   
British union for the abolition of vivisection
16a Crane Grove
London N7 8LB / GB
09.03.1992No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.02.1993No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
23.02.1993No. 07: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
24.02.1993No. 08: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
01.03.1993No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
01.03.1993No. 14: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
01.03.1993No. 15: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
02.03.1993No. 03: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
10.03.1993No. 07: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
19.03.1993No. 03: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
23.03.1993No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
05.04.1993No. 14: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
08.04.1993No. 08: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
08.04.1993No. 15: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
15.06.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.1994Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.11.1995Date of oral proceedings
15.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M12)
15.04.1996Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.11.2001Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.01.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.07.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.05.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.03.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
24.03.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/33]
Appeal following opposition26.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0315/03
26.05.2003Statement of grounds filed
06.07.2004Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0315/03
23.05.2003Statement of grounds filed
06.07.2004Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
13.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0019/90
13.03.2003Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2003Appeal received No.  T0019/90
24.11.2003Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2003/48]
05.07.2004Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB23.06.2005
NL24.06.2005
[2006/14]
Former [2006/13]GB23.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[AD]  - SCIENCE, vol. 217, no. 4564, September 10, 1982 (Washington) T.A. STEWART et al. "Human b-Globin Gene Sequences Injected into Mouse Eggs, Retained in Adults, and Transmitted to Progeny" pages 1046-1048,
 [AD]  - COSTANTINI F, LACY E, "INTRODUCTION OF A RABBIT BETA-GLOBIN GENE INTO THE MOUSE GERM LINE", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19811105), vol. 294, no. 5836, doi:10.1038/294092a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 92 - 94, XP009032156

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/294092a0
 [AD]  - CELL, vol. 34, no. 2, September 1983 (Cambridge, Mass.) G.S.MC KNIGHT et al. "Expressing of the Chicken Transferrin Gene in Transgenic Mice" pages 335-341,
 [AD]  - BRINSTER R L, ET AL., "EXPRESSION OF A MICROINJECTED IMMUNOGLOBULIN GENE IN THE SPLEEN OF TRANSGENIC MICE", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19831124), vol. 306, no. 5941, doi:10.1038/306332a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 332 - 336, XP001181650

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/306332a0
 [AD]  - PALMITER R D, ET AL., "DRAMATIC GROWTH OF MICE THAT DEVELOP FROM EGGS MICROINJECTED WITH METALLOTHIONEIN-GROWTH HORMONE FUSION GENES", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19821216), vol. 300, no. 5893, doi:10.1038/300611a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 611 - 615, XP009032157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/300611a0
by applicant   - WAGNER ET AL., P.N.A.S. U.S.A., (1981), vol. 78, page 5016,
    - STEWART ET AL., SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 217, page 1046,
    - CONSTANTINI ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 294, page 92,
    - LACY ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 34, page 343,
    - MCKNIGHT ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 34, page 335,
    - BRINSTER ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 306, page 332,
    - PALMITER ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 300, page 611,
    - PALMITER ET AL., CELL, (1982), vol. 29, page 701,
    - PALMITER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 222, page 809,
    - LEDER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 222, page 765,
    - HUANG, CELL, (1981), vol. 27, page 245,
    - DAVIS ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1980),
    - SOUTHERN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1975), vol. 98, page 503,
    - CHRIGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, page 5294,
    - LEY ET AL., PNAS USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 4775,
    - BERK ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. 12, page 721,
    - BATTEY ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 34, page 779,
    - LEHRACH ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 16, page 4743,
    - TAU ET AL., PNAS USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 7837,
    - KIRSCH ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 293, page 585,
    - GORMAN ET AL., PNAS USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 6777,