EP0208029 - Apparatus for dispensing medication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buttarazzi, Patrick J. 4 Fitch Avenue Auburn New York 13021 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states Buttarazzi, Patrick J. 4 Fitch Avenue Auburn New York 13021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1987/03] | Jennings, Guy Kenneth GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85304868.4 | 08.07.1985 | [1987/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208029 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208029 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137, G07F7/02 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
B65G1/1373 (EP);
G07F17/0092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/03] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung für Medikamente | [1987/03] | English: | Apparatus for dispensing medication | [1987/03] | French: | Appareil pour la distribution de médicaments | [1987/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.07.1989 | SE | 09.07.1989 | [1990/26] |
Former [1990/19] | SE | 09.07.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3878967 ; | [A]US3586186 ; | [A]DE3317087 ; | [E]US4546901 |