|
25.02.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1996 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1995 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.07.1995 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1995 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
08.07.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.1987 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1985 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.1985 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |