|
14.12.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.1995 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.10.1994 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.04.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1994 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1994 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
24.02.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.02.1994 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1993 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1993 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1993 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.1993 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.06.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.1989 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.1988 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1987 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1986 |
Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |