EP0183533 - Organopolysiloxane compounds containing SiC-bonded alkoxysilylalkyl and polyoxyalkylene radicals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.02.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ona, Isao 2848 Kubota Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Taki, Yoichioro 1-6, Nishi Yushudai Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Ozaki, Masaru 1-6, Nishi Yushudai Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Tadashi 1-6, Nishi Yushudai Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308608.0 | 27.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | JP19840249890 | 27.11.1984 Original published format: JP 24989084 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183533 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183533 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/16, C08G77/46, C08G77/50 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
C08G77/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/23] | C08G77/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/23] | Title | German: | Organopolysiloxanverbindungen, die SiC-gebundene Alkoxysilylalkyl- und Polyoxyalkylenradikale enthalten | [1986/23] | English: | Organopolysiloxane compounds containing SiC-bonded alkoxysilylalkyl and polyoxyalkylene radicals | [1986/23] | French: | Composés d'organopolysiloxane contenant des radicaux d'alcoxysilylalkyle et polyoxyalkylène attachés par liaison SiC | [1986/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 08.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/13] | 09.11.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0032310 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |