EP0164297 - Diamond drill bit with varied cutting elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUGHES TOOL COMPANY 5425 Polk Avenue Houston Texas 77023 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states HUGHES TOOL COMPANY 5425 Polk Avenue Houston Texas 77023 / US | ||
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states HUGHES TOOL COMPANY-USA 5425 Polk Avenue Houston Texas 77023 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weaver, Gary Eugene 66 Gleneagle Drive Conroe Texas 77385 / US | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85630003.3 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840618113 | 07.06.1984 Original published format: US 618113 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164297 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164297 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164297 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/46 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
E21B10/5673 (EP,US);
E21B10/46 (EP,US);
E21B10/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [1985/50] | Title | German: | Diamantbohrmeissel mit unterschiedlichen Schneideelementen | [1985/50] | English: | Diamond drill bit with varied cutting elements | [1985/50] | French: | Trépan à diamants muni d'éléments de coupe divers | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3693735 (CORTES ABEL C); | [A]US4244432 (ROWLEY DAVID S, et al); | [X]GB2086451 (CHRISTENSEN INC) | [Y] - OIL & GAS JOURNAL, vol. 82, no. 14, 2nd April 1984, pages 133-138, Tulsa, Oklahoma, US; J. WOOD: "Thermally stable cutters extend application of synthetic diamond bits to hard formations" |