EP0173637 - Lock nut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/10] | Self-cleaning beam nut | ||
[1988/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXNORD HOLDINGS INC. 350 North Sunny Slope Brookfield, WISCONSIN 53005 / US | [1989/08] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states REXNORD INC. 350 N. Sunny Slope Road Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cosenza, Frank J. 1524 West Fifth Street San Pedro California 90732 / US | 02 /
Warkentin, Roy L. 1964 West 259th Place Lomita California 90717 / US | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85630133.8 | 21.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | US19840644417 | 27.08.1984 Original published format: US 644417 | [1986/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173637 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173637 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/286 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
F16B37/002 (EP);
F16B39/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1986/10] | Title | German: | Sicherungsmutter | [1988/22] | English: | Lock nut | [1988/22] | French: | Ecrou de freinage | [1988/22] |
Former [1986/10] | Selbstreinigende, armierte Mutter | ||
Former [1986/10] | Self-cleaning beam nut | ||
Former [1986/10] | Ecrou armé autonettoyant | Examination procedure | 13.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 08.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.06.1988 | NL | 01.06.1988 | LU | 31.08.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/11] | BE | 01.06.1988 | |
NL | 01.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 01.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1802372 [ ]; | US3702628 [ ]; | DE2055937 [ ]; | DE1811370 [ ] |