|
18.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1994 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1994 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.01.1994 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.09.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.09.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
05.09.1993 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.09.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.05.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.10.1992 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.10.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1992 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.02.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1990 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.1989 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.11.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1988 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.1988 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.09.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.08.1987 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1986 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1986 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1985 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1985 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.12.1985 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.1985 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.1985 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.08.1985 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.03.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |