|
01.12.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.09.1995 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.08.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1995 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1994 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.06.1994 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.04.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1991 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1991 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1991 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1990 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.08.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.12.1988 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1988 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.1988 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.09.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.1986 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1986 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1986 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.1986 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.04.1986 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1986 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.04.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.11.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1985 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |