EP0189105 - Output compartment for a voucher processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | [1991/40] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dempf, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Südstrasse 7 D-8933 Klosterlechfeld / DE | 02 /
Moser, Erich Dorfstrasse 8 D-8028 Taufkirchen / DE | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100455.4 | 15.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | DE19853502505 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3502505 | [1986/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189105 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189105 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189105 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/08 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
G06K13/08 (EP,US);
B65H31/3009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Ausgabefach für eine Belegverarbeitungseinrichtung | [1986/31] | English: | Output compartment for a voucher processing device | [1986/31] | French: | Casier de sortie pour une installation de traitement de documents | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56168274 ; | [A]DE7247153U ; | [A]US4262817 (FISH LEONARD A) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 53 (P-109)[931], 8. April 1982; & JP-A-56 168 274 (OKI DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 24.12.1981, & JP56168274 A 00000000 |