EP0208880 - A sealing assembly, particularly for bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIV-SKF OFFICINE DI VILLAR PEROSA S.p.A Via Mazzini 53 I-10123 Torino / IT | [1987/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colanzi, Franco Piazza Rivoli, 6 I-10100 Torino / IT | 02 /
Vignotto, Angelo Via Montevideo, 6 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 86107128.0 | 25.05.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | IT19850053531U | 21.06.1985 Original published format: IT 5353185 U | [1987/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208880 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208880 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208880 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/76 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
F16J15/3256 (EP,US);
F16C33/7853 (EP,US);
F16J15/3212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Dichtungsbaueinheit speziell für Lager | [1987/04] | English: | A sealing assembly, particularly for bearings | [1987/04] | French: | Assemblage d'étanchéité particulièrement pour des paliers | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 16.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53140443 ; | [A]DE1169214 (EMIL DEUSSEN, et al); | [A]US3245735 (HANS SIKORA); | [A]DE3009977 (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 16 (M-48), 10th February 1979, page 56 M 48; & JP - A - 53 140 443 (NIPPON SEIKO) 07-12-1978, & JP53140443 A 00000000 |