|
20.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.07.1993 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.1993 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.06.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1993 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.04.1991 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.09.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1990 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.1990 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.12.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.10.1989 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.02.1989 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1988 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1988 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
18.04.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.06.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |