EP0211297 - Motor vehicle, particularly passenger car, having at least one spoiler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baron, Günter Krokusweg 8 D-8037 Neu-Esting / DE | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung AJ-31 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Dexheimer, Rolf Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung AJ-31 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109926.5 | 19.07.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | DE19853528113 | 06.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3528113 | [1987/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0211297 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0211297 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211297 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62D35/00 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
B62D35/00 (EP);
B60R9/045 (EP);
B60R9/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug, insbesondere Personenkraftwagen, mit wenigstens einem Spoiler | [1987/09] | English: | Motor vehicle, particularly passenger car, having at least one spoiler | [1987/09] | French: | Véhicule à moteur, notamment voiture particulière, ayant au moins un déflecteur aérodynamique | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 05.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3024897 (BRINKMANN BRIGITTE [DE], et al) | Examination | DE3006304 |