EP0217117 - Bulkhead for an aircraft fuselage to be put under internal pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephen, Gerhard Tessiner Strasse 103 D-2800 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Wrobel, Joachim Allerstrasse 58 D-2806 Oyten / DE | [1987/15] | Application number, filing date | 86111722.4 | 25.08.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | DE19853534719 | 28.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3534719 | [1987/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217117 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217117 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/10, B64D25/00 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
B64D25/00 (EP,US);
B64C1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/15] | Title | German: | Druckwand für einen unter inneren Druck setzbaren Rumpf eines Luftfahrzeuges | [1987/15] | English: | Bulkhead for an aircraft fuselage to be put under internal pressure | [1987/15] | French: | Paroi à pression pour une cabine pressurisée d'un aéronef | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2669402 (DEL MAR BRUCE E); | [Y]FR2320864 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]US4055317 (GREISS RASHAD S); | [A]DE2913050 (BRUEGGEMANN & BRAND KG) |