EP0217163 - Device for mounting and supporting electrical interior constructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedl, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Herbststrasse 15 D-8035 Gauting / DE | 02 /
Mayer, Franz Wastl-Witt-Strasse 11 D-8000 München 21 / DE | 03 /
Neumann, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Kardinal-Wendel-Strasse 58 D-8190 Wolfratshausen / DE | 04 /
Hirsch, Gerhard, Ing. grad. Häfnersweg 66 D-7150 Backnang / DE | 05 /
Stephan, Roland, Ing. grad. Glasäckerstrasse 33 D-7151 Allmersbach i.T. / DE | 06 /
Hohloch, Manfred Trailhöferstrasse 86 D-7151 Auenwald / DE | 07 /
Latsch, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hermann-Hesse-Weg 2 D-7151 Auenwald / DE | [1989/52] |
Former [1987/15] | 01 /
Riedl, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Herbststrasse 15 D-8035 Gauting / DE | ||
02 /
Mayer, Franz Wastl- Witt-Strasse 11 D-8000 München 21 / DE | |||
03 /
Neumann, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Kardinal-Wendel-Strasse 58 D-8190 Wolfratshausen / DE | |||
04 /
Hirsch, Gerhard, Ing. grad. Häfnersweg 66 D-7150 Backnang / DE | |||
05 /
Stephan, Roland, Ing. grad. Glasäckerstrasse 33 D-7151 Allmersbach i.T. / DE | |||
06 /
Hohloch, Manfred Trailhöferstrasse 86 D-7151 Auenwald / DE | |||
07 /
Latsch, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hermann-Hesse-Weg 2 D-7151 Auenwald / DE | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112161.4 | 02.09.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | DE19853531718 | 05.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3531718 | [1987/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217163 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217163 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H05K7/18 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
H05K7/1418 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/15] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Montage und Halterung elektrischer Inneneinbauten | [1987/15] | English: | Device for mounting and supporting electrical interior constructions | [1987/15] | French: | Dispositif pour monter et supporter des constructions électriques intérieures | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 09.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0105150 (CONTRAVES AG [CH]); | [A]DE1282758 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]DE2119709 ; | [AD]DE2514048 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AD]DE3110717 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |