|
10.09.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2000 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.1999 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1999 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
10.08.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1996 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1995 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1992 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1992 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1986 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |