|
04.01.1996 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1995 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1995 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1995 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1995 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.03.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.03.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1994 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.1993 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1992 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.09.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1990 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1990 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.07.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.1987 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1986 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |