EP0223191 - Optical head Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shikama, Shinsuke 1, Babazusho Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Toide, Eiichi 1, Babazusho Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115664.4 | 11.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | JP19850260356 | 20.11.1985 Original published format: JP 26035685 | JP19850260358 | 20.11.1985 Original published format: JP 26035885 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223191 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223191 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223191 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, // G11B11/10 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/22] | Title | German: | Gerät mit optischem Kopf | [1987/22] | English: | Optical head Apparatus | [1987/22] | French: | Appareil à tête optique | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2313732 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | WO8602191 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]); | DE3341589 [ ] (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) | Examination | EP0109194 | - Philips Technical Review 40,No.6 1982, pages 151-156 "The Compact Disc Digital Audio System". |