EP0229299 - A nonblocking self-routing packet and circuit switching network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1987/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Payne, William Andrew III 104 Majestic Drive Lombard Illinois 60148 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116994.4 | 06.12.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | US19850808344 | 12.12.1985 Original published format: US 808344 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229299 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229299 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229299 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/68, H04L12/54 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
H04L49/606 (EP,US);
H04L49/106 (EP,US);
H04L49/1507 (EP,US);
H04L49/1515 (EP,US);
H04L49/1553 (EP,US);
H04L49/203 (EP,US);
H04L49/256 (EP,US);
H04Q3/68 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5641 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5679 (EP,US);
H04L49/201 (EP,US);
H04L49/253 (EP,US);
H04L49/506 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | H04Q3/68, H04L11/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Ein blockierungsfreies selbstsuchendes Paket- und Leitungsvermittlungsnetzwerk | [1991/39] | English: | A nonblocking self-routing packet and circuit switching network | [1987/30] | French: | Réseau de commutation par paquets et circuits sans blocage autocherchant | [1987/30] |
Former [1987/30] | Ein blockierungsfreies selbstsuchendes Paket- und Schaltungsvermittlungsnetzwerk | Examination procedure | 12.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0146275 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]); | [A]WO8404015 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [AD]US4550397 (TURNER JONATHAN S [US], et al) |