EP0198683 - Absorbent structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For:CH
LI
SE
AT
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | For:BE
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For:CH
LI
SE
AT
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
For:BE
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
Former [1986/43] | For:CH
LI
SE
AT
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
For:BE
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duenk, Elisabeth Hendrika Avenue Vanderaey 70 B-1180 Brussel / BE | 02 /
Fischer, Walter Jakob Finkenweg 6 D-5350 Euskirchen Flamersheim / DE | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1993/48] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1986/43] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302696.9 | 11.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | GB19850009591 | 15.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8509591 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198683 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198683 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198683 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0198683 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/46, A61F5/44, A61F13/15 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
A61F13/534 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/530131 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530481 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53051 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530532 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530569 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53062 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/43] | A61F13/18, A61F5/44, A41B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Absorbierendes Material | [1986/43] | English: | Absorbent structures | [1986/43] | French: | Structures absorbantes | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 22.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1992
25.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE VP- SCHICKEDANZ AG Schoppershofstrasse 80 D-90489 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Manfred, et al, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 02
09.09.1992
25.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Mölnlycke Absorbent Products Supply AB S-43581 Mölnlycke / SE Opponent's representative Brauns, Hans-Adolf, et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1992
25.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE VP- SCHICKEDANZ AG Schoppershofstrasse 80 D-90489 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Rau, Schneck & Hübner, Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
09.09.1992
25.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Mölnlycke Absorbent Products Supply AB S-43581 Mölnlycke / SE Opponent's representative Brauns, Hans-Adolf, Dr. rer. nat., et al, et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | 16.10.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.03.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.11.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.07.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.09.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.1994 | Appeal received No. T0112/94 | 21.04.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.10.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 20.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0108637 (PERSONAL PRODUCTS CO [US]) |