Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0202780 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0202780



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1859
26.06.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.06.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.10.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
15.10.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
15.10.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
29.10.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.10.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.09.1998 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
16.09.1998 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
16.09.1998 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.07.1998 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.07.1998 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.07.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
17.07.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
14.07.1998 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
17.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.04.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
08.04.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.1998 Means of redress Opposition 1
08.04.1998 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
07.04.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.01.1998 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
15.01.1998 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.10.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
02.10.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
02.10.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.07.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 2
30.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.07.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
08.07.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
08.07.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
01.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
09.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.06.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.06.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
31.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.01.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
30.01.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.06.1996 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
24.06.1996 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 23
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 72
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 68
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 33
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
13.06.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
13.06.1996 Claims Opposition 2
13.06.1996 Claims Opposition 3
13.06.1996 Claims Opposition 2
13.06.1996 Claims Opposition 2
13.06.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
13.06.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.04.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
22.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
22.04.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
16.04.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
16.04.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
01.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.03.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.12.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.12.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 180
29.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
21.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1995 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
16.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.11.1995 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
13.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
19.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
19.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
19.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
16.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
16.10.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 14
16.10.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
13.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
13.10.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
13.10.1995 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
13.10.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 42
02.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
29.09.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
26.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.09.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.09.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
30.06.1995 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.06.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.06.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
19.06.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
19.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
09.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
19.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.05.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
11.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
09.03.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.01.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.07.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.07.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.07.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.07.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 7
27.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.06.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
03.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
25.05.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
20.05.1994 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.05.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
29.04.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.04.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.04.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.04.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
22.04.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.04.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.04.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.04.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 8
14.04.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
30.03.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.03.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.03.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.03.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.03.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
18.03.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
11.02.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.02.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.02.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.02.1994 Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal Appeal 2
09.02.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.02.1994 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.02.1994 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.02.1994 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.02.1994 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.02.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.02.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.02.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.02.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
31.01.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.01.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.01.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
28.01.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.01.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
26.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
26.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
26.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
26.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
24.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.01.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.01.1994 Composition of the board Appeal 1
20.01.1994 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.12.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 8
20.12.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 8
15.12.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.12.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.12.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.12.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
06.12.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.12.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
29.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.1993 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 1
10.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
06.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.11.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.11.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.11.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
04.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.10.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.10.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.09.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.09.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
30.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.08.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
09.08.1993 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
05.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.08.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
17.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.07.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
30.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
28.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
28.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.04.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.03.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.03.1993 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
01.03.1993 Designation of inventor Opposition 1
01.03.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.02.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.02.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
24.02.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.02.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.02.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
15.12.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 27
02.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.04.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
01.04.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.03.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.03.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.02.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.01.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.12.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.12.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.12.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
02.12.1991 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
02.12.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
02.12.1991 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
02.12.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
01.08.1991 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.07.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
10.12.1990 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 10
07.11.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.11.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.10.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
30.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.09.1990 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
17.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
02.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.11.1989 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.09.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.04.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
13.04.1989 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.04.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.04.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
13.04.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
06.04.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.04.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
20.03.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.09.1987 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
31.08.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
30.08.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.10.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.05.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
09.05.1986 Priority document Search / examination 20
09.05.1986 Priority document Search / examination 20
21.04.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.04.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
21.04.1986 Description Search / examination 39
21.04.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.1986 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.04.1986 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.04.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5