EP0213788 - Method for improving the clarity of propylene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXENE PRODUCTS COMPANY (A Delaware Corporation) 2400 South Grandview Avenue Odessa Texas 79766 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states REXENE PRODUCTS COMPANY (A Delaware Corporation) 2400 South Grandview Avenue Odessa Texas 79766 / US | ||
Former [1988/47] | For all designated states EL PASO PRODUCTS COMPANY (A Delaware Corporation) 2400 South Grandview Avenue Odessa Texas 79766 / US | ||
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states EL PASO PRODUCTS COMPANY 2400, South Grandview Avenue Odessa, Texas 79760 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ficker, Harold Kurt 16 Adelphia Road Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | 02 /
Teskin, Frederick Michael 3231 Tranquility Lane Herndon Virginia 22071 / US | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1987/11] | Application number, filing date | 86306038.0 | 05.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | US19850762902 | 06.08.1985 Original published format: US 762902 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213788 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213788 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213788 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08L23/10, // (C08K5/00, 5:09, 5:17, 5:20) | [1987/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/17 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/17, C08L23/10 (US,EP);
C08K5/20, C08L23/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Reinheit von Propylenpolymeren | [1987/11] | English: | Method for improving the clarity of propylene polymers | [1987/11] | French: | Procédé d'amélioration de la clarté de polymères de propylène | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 09.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3165492 [ ] (THOLSTRUP CLARENCE E, et al); | US3207734 [ ] (YOSHIO TSUNODA, et al); | US4314040 [ ] (CASTRO ANTHONY J, et al) | Examination | US3207739 |