EP0215583 - Bipolar and/or MOS devices fabricated on integrated circuit substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Mammen 1081 Corvette Drive San Jose California 95120 / US | 02 /
Weinberg, Matthew 111 North Rengstorff Mt. View California 94043 / US | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306397.0 | 19.08.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | US19850777149 | 18.09.1985 Original published format: US 777149 | US19860869759 | 02.06.1986 Original published format: US 869759 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0215583 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0215583 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/06, H01L23/52, H01L21/82, H01L21/90 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
H01L27/0623 (EP,US);
H01L21/76819 (EP,US);
H01L21/8249 (EP,US);
Y10S257/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/13] | H01L27/06, H01L23/52, H01L21/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Bipolare/MOS-Bauelemente auf IC-Substraten | [1987/13] | English: | Bipolar and/or MOS devices fabricated on integrated circuit substrates | [1987/13] | French: | Dispositifs bipolaires/MOS sur des substrats à circuits intégrés | [1987/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0110211 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0145927 (IBM [US]); | [E]EP0203836 (EFCIS [FR]); | [A]WO8504049 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 24, no. 5, October 1981, pages 2543-44, New York, US; H.J. GEIPEL et al.: "Method for making an FET having high conductivity gate, source and drain electrodes". | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 8, January 1983, pages 4433-4435, New York, US; I. ANTIPOV et al.: "Polysilicon-base transistor structure with improved characteristics". |