|
02.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
19.06.1995 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1995 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1995 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.08.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
17.08.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.06.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.04.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
02.09.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.1992 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.07.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
31 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
32 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.05.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.09.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
44 |
|
17.07.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1990 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1990 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1990 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.01.1990 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
100 |
|
30.11.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.1989 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.1988 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.06.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.1988 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.1988 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1987 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1987 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |