EP0228247 - Corona discharge treating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 162 oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states SANKYO DENGYO CO., LTD. 14-13, Hon-cho 1-Chome Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsui, Koichi 5-chome, 13-4, Osumigaoka Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Shoji 2-503, 67, Nishimachi Ikaga Hirakata Osaka / JP | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Brereton, Paul Arthur, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Brereton, Paul Arthur, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309876.0 | 17.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | JP19850295327 | 25.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29532785 | JP19850295328 | 25.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29532885 | JP19850295329 | 25.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29532985 | JP19850295330 | 25.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29533085 | JP19850295331 | 25.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29533185 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228247 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228247 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228247 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01T19/00, B29C59/10 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
H01T19/00 (EP,US);
B23H1/00 (KR);
B29C59/103 (EP,US);
C08J7/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/28] | B29C59/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/28] | Title | German: | Behandlungssystem mit Koronaentladung | [1987/28] | English: | Corona discharge treating system | [1987/28] | French: | Système de traitement à décharge corona | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 14.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3102193 (LEONARD DOBENS WILLIAM); | [X]DE3400325 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE], et al); | [A]US3183352 (ROGER BRANDT, et al); | [A]DE1208629 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]US3655966 (TAKIMOTO MASAAKI, et al) | Examination | EP0219679 |