EP0232641 - Cellular array processing apparatus with on-chip RAM and address generator apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morton, Steven Gregory 39 Old Good Hill Road Oxford, CT 06483 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/43] | Morstadt, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH, Patentabteilung, Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1987/34] | Polus, Camille c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402738.8 | 10.12.1986 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19850808314 | 12.12.1985 Original published format: US 808314 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232641 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232641 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/06 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
G06F11/2051 (EP,US);
G01R31/318505 (EP,US);
G06F15/8007 (EP,US);
G11C29/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Zellularer Feldprozessor mit integriertem RAM-Speicher und Adressengenerator | [1987/34] | English: | Cellular array processing apparatus with on-chip RAM and address generator apparatus | [1987/34] | French: | Processeur en réseau cellulaire comportant une mémoire RAM intégrée et un générateur d'adresses | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/32] | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ED]EP0226103 (ITT [US]) | [X] - IEEE MICRO, December 1985, pages 37-49IEEE; S.G. MORTON; "ITT CAP - toward a personal supercomputer" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, vol. C-27, no. 2, February 1978, pages 144-156IEEE; R.P. ROESSER; "Two-dimensional microprocessor pipelines for image processing" |