EP0202195 - Process for the preparation of pyridinyloxy-nitrobenzol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/47] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rempfler, Hermann, Dr. Brücklismattstrasse 16 CH-4107 Ettingen / CH | 02 /
Pissiotas, Georg, Dr. Am Sonnenrain 71 D-7850 Lörrach / DE | [1986/47] | Application number, filing date | 86810206.2 | 06.05.1986 | [1986/47] | Priority number, date | US19850733821 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: US 733821 | [1986/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0202195 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0202195 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/64, // C07C131/00 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
C07D213/643 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pyridinyloxy-nitrobenzol-Derivaten | [1986/47] | English: | Process for the preparation of pyridinyloxy-nitrobenzol derivatives | [1986/47] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés pyridinyloxy-nitrobenzène | [1986/47] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 01.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0023891 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0112524 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]); | [A]US2712031 (HUFFMAN MAX N) |