|
21.12.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.08.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
25 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
41 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
35 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
102 |
|
27.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2004 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Notification of decision |
Appeal |
47 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
16 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
38 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
27 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Composition of the board |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
118 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
67 |
|
24.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
06.01.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.11.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1999 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.06.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
78 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
47 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
23 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Description |
Opposition |
36 |
|
10.12.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
69 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
50 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
42 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1997 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
09.07.1996 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1995 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1994 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.08.1994 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
07.06.1994 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1994 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.03.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1994 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.01.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
03.11.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.09.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
27.11.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.06.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1989 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1989 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.03.1987 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.1987 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1987 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1987 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.1987 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1986 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.1986 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |