|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Brief communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
N/A |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
14.12.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.12.2004 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.08.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2003 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
21 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.08.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.02.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.1998 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1998 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.1997 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.11.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1996 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.1996 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.03.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1994 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.09.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1993 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1993 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1993 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
72 |
|
15.04.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
26 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.03.1993 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.03.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1992 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1992 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1991 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.10.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.05.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.04.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.10.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.10.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.10.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.01.1990 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1989 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
16.02.1989 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.1988 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.1988 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.11.1987 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1987 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.1987 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
01.07.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |