EP0229122 - WARP KNITTING LOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBA Maschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach 1120 D-95112 Naila / DE | [1987/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENZLER, Karl Hubertusstr. 1 D-8674 Naila / DE | 02 /
BÖHM, Alfred Humboldtstrasse D-8674 Naila-Hölle / DE | 03 /
HÄGEL, Adolf Bobengrün 68 D-8675 Bad Steben / DE | 04 /
WIRTH, Rudi Bergstr. 6 D-8671 Döbra / DE | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/30] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904088.1 | 03.07.1986 | [1987/30] | WO1986DE00277 | Priority number, date | DE19853523794 | 03.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3523794 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700216 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229122 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229122 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D04B27/22 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
D04B27/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1987/30] | Title | German: | KETTENWIRKMASCHINE | [1987/30] | English: | WARP KNITTING LOOM | [1987/30] | French: | METIER DE TRICOTAGE EN CHAINE | [1987/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB907342 [ ] (TULLMASCHB KARL MARX STADT VEB); | BE665453 [ ]; | FR1530964 [ ] (COURTAULDS LTD); | GB1593033 [ ] (SCAPA ENG) | Examination | US2625021 | DE3025782 |