EP0245347 - DESENSITIZING DENTAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neirinckx, Rudi Dominique Hohe Winde-Strasse 12 CH-4059 Basel / CH | [1987/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1987/47] | Ritter, Stephen David Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906415.4 | 07.11.1986 | [1987/47] | WO1986GB00690 | Priority number, date | GB19850027962 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: GB 8527962 | [1987/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702890 | Date: | 21.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245347 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245347 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K7/18 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/21 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] |
Former [1987/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | DENTALE DESENSIBILISIERENDE ZUBEREITUNG | [1987/47] | English: | DESENSITIZING DENTAL COMPOSITION | [1987/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DENTAIRE DE DESENSIBILISATION | [1987/47] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/35: Verbunden mit 86308687.2/0222603 (eurppäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 13.01.89 | EPB 1990/35: Consolidated with 86308687.2/0222603 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 13.01.89 | EPB 1990/35: Jointe à la demande no. 86308687.2/0222603 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 13.01.89 | EPB 1990/34: Verbunden mit 86308687.2/0222603 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 13.02.89 | EPB 1990/34: Consolidated with 86308687.2/0222603 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 13.02.89 | EPB 1990/34: Jointe à la demande no. 86308687.2/0222603 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 13.02.89 | EPB 1989/13: 130289 | EPB 1989/13: 130289 | EPB 1989/13: 130289 | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Request for further processing for: | 24.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3122483 [ ] (ROSENTHAL MURRAY W); | FR2329292 [ ] (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | FR2361851 [ ] (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | US4083955 [ ] (GRABENSTETTER ROBERT JOHN, et al); | GB1552119 [ ] (BOOTS CO LTD) |