EP0234191 - Packet-switched communications network with parallel virtual circuits for re-routing message packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hiroshi c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100126.9 | 08.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | JP19860002442 | 09.01.1986 Original published format: JP 244286 | JP19860085184 | 15.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8518486 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234191 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234191 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234191 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
H04L45/26 (EP,US);
H04L45/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/247 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | H04L11/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/36] | Title | German: | Paketvermitteltes Fernmeldenetz mit parallelen virtuellen Verbindungen zur Umweglenkung von Nachrichtenpaketen | [1987/36] | English: | Packet-switched communications network with parallel virtual circuits for re-routing message packets | [1987/36] | French: | Réseau de télécommunication en mode paquet avec des connexions vituelles parallèles pour le reroutage de paquets de message | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59152755 ; | [A]JP59186447 ; | [A]JP60065644 ; | [A]GB2035755 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRATCS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 4 (E-288)[1727], 10th January 1985; & JP-A-59 152 755 (FUJITSU K.K.) 31-08-1984, & JP59152755 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 47 (E-299)[1770], 27th February 1985; & JP-A-59 186 447 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 23-10-1984, & JP59186447 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 201 (E-336)[1924], 17th August 1985; & JP-A-60 065 644 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 15-04-1985, & JP60065644 A 00000000 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATION, Atlanta, 27th-30th October 1980, pages 90-95; K. MARUYAMA et al.: "On the generation of explicit routing tables" |