EP0232831 - Screw-threaded cable fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holzmann, Hermann Salzäckerstrasse 59 D-70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Otte, Peter Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Mollenbachstrasse 37 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101427.0 | 03.02.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | DE19863604214 | 11.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604214 | [1987/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232831 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232831 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232831 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/06 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
H02G3/0658 (EP,US);
Y10S285/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Kabelverschraubung | [1987/34] | English: | Screw-threaded cable fitting | [1987/34] | French: | Accessoire de câble fileté | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.06.1992 | NL | 03.06.1992 | SE | 03.06.1992 | ES | 14.09.1992 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 03.06.1992 | |
NL | 03.06.1992 | ||
SE | 03.06.1992 | ||
LU | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/03] | NL | 03.06.1992 | |
SE | 03.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2091369 (HUBBELL INC HARVEY); | [A]EP0165414 (HOLZMANN HERMANN); | [XP]DE8603582U ; | [XP]DE8603583U ; | [E]DE3604213 (HOLZMANN HERMANN) |