EP0239846 - Flexible and electrically conducting composite materials, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldhues, Michael Dr. Königsteiner Strasse 1a D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1987/41] | Application number, filing date | 87103586.1 | 12.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | DE19863609646 | 21.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3609646 | [1987/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239846 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239846 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, D01F11/10 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
H01M4/137 (EP);
C08G61/123 (EP);
D01F11/14 (EP);
D01F11/16 (EP);
H01B1/04 (EP);
H01B1/127 (EP);
H01M4/60 (EP);
H01M4/66 (EP);
H01M4/663 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/46] |
Former [1987/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Flexible, elektrisch leitfähige Verbundkörper, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1990/46] | English: | Flexible and electrically conducting composite materials, process for their preparation and their use | [1987/41] | French: | Matériaux composites conducteurs, flexibles, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation | [1987/41] |
Former [1987/41] | Flexible, elektrisch leitfóhige Verbundk rper, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58189968 ; | [AD]JP5889639 ; | [A]JP59157974 ; | [X]EP0076119 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [A]US4233378 (JOO' LOUIS A, et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 29 (E-226)[1466], 7. Februar 1984; & JP-A-58 189 968 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 05-11-1983, & JP58189968 A 00000000 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 24, 12. Dezember 1983, Seite 60, Zusammenfassung Nr. 196277g, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 89 639 (TEIJIN LTD) 28-05-1983, & JP5889639 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 102, Nr. 6, 11. Februar 1985, Seite 176, Zusammenfassung Nr. 48759f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 157 974 (KAO CO.) 07-09-1984, & JP59157974 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 102, Nr. 20, 20. Mai 1985, Seite 8, Zusammenfassung Nr. 167274d, Columbus, Ohio, US; R. LAZZARONI et al.: "Electrochemical synthesis of heteroaromatic polymers: new compounds and novel substrates", & MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST. 1985, 118(1-4), 249-52 | Examination | - Erweiterte Zusammenfassung, Dechema Vortrag, Dechema Jahres Tagung der Biotechnologen 3. 4. October 1985 |