EP0241918 - 1-Hydroxy-2-pyridinones, process for their preparation and medicines containing them, as well as intermediates formed by the preparation of 1-hydroxy-2-pyridinones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohaus, Gerhard, Dr. Uhlandweg 4 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Dittmar, Walter, Dr. Uhlandstrasse 10 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Hänel, Heinz, Dr. Tannenwaldallee 80 D-6380 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
Raether, Wolfgang, Dr. Falkensteinstrasse 6 D-6072 Dreieich / DE | 05 /
Reuschling, Dieter, Dr. Beethovenstrasse 27 D-6308 Butzbach / DE | 06 /
Gröbel, Bengt-Thomas, Dr. Im Hainpfad 10 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87105537.2 | 14.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | DE19863613061 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3613061 | DE19863626211 | 02.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3626211 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241918 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241918 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241918 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/89, A61K31/44, // C07D309/38 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
C07D213/89 (EP,KR,US);
C07D309/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | 1-Hydroxy-2-pyridone, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Arzneimittel, die sie enthalten, sowie bei der Herstellung der 1-Hydroxy-2-pyridone gebildete Zwischenprodukte | [1987/43] | English: | 1-Hydroxy-2-pyridinones, process for their preparation and medicines containing them, as well as intermediates formed by the preparation of 1-hydroxy-2-pyridinones | [1987/43] | French: | Hydroxy-1-pyridin-2-ones, procédé pour leur préparation et médicaments qui les contiennent de même que des intermédiaires formés lors de la préparation des hydroxy-1-pyridin-2-ones | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2214608 (HOECHST AG); | [AD]DE2234009 (HOECHST AG) |