EP0250808 - Door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Wolfgang Apostelholzweg 36 D-8031 Neu-Gilching / DE | 02 /
Possenriede, Herbert Raffoltstrasse 17 D-8690 Schweitenkirchen / DE | 03 /
Wilms, Hans Edelweissstrasse 8 D-8031 Maisach / DE | 04 /
Köstler, Ulrich Josef Carl-v.-Linde-strasse 35 D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 87106958.9 | 13.05.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | DE19863622048 | 01.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3622048 | [1988/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250808 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250808 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250808 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/32 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
E05B85/243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Türschloss | [1988/01] | English: | Door lock | [1988/01] | French: | Serrure pour porte | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2034802 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG); | [A]GB1207774 (KIEKERT SOEHNE ARN [DE]); | [A]US2904988 (GAIDA JOSEPH B); | [A]DE8505832U |