EP0257202 - Process for the manufacture of 1,12-dodecandioic acid I [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 20.03.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrade, Juan, Dr. 545 Barnett Place Ridgewood N.J. 07450 / US | 02 /
Köhler, Klaus Kettelerstrasse 37 D-6452 Hainburg / DE | 03 /
Prescher, Günter, Dr. Liesingstrasse 2 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | [1988/09] | Application number, filing date | 87107243.5 | 19.05.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | DE19863628662 | 23.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3628662 | [1988/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257202 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257202 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257202 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/235, C07C55/21, C07C45/50, B01J23/34 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
C07C51/235 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/50, C07C47/12 (EP,US);
C07C51/235, C07C55/21 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1988/09] | C07C51/145, C07C55/21, B01J31/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,12-Dodecandisäure I | [1988/09] | English: | Process for the manufacture of 1,12-dodecandioic acid I | [1988/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de l'acide 1,12-dodécandioique I | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.1990
10.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | [1990/37] | 15.10.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.02.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.01.1992 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.1991 | SE | 20.05.1991 | NL | 01.12.1991 | [1995/03] |
Former [1994/32] | AT | 19.05.1991 | |
SE | 20.05.1991 | ||
NL | 01.12.1991 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 19.05.1991 | |
SE | 20.05.1991 | ||
NL | 01.12.1991 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 19.05.1991 | |
SE | 20.05.1991 | ||
NL | 01.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 19.05.1991 | |
SE | 20.05.1991 | ||
NL | 01.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | SE | 20.05.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP6230734 ; | [AP]JP61238751 ; | [A]DE2658043 (HOECHST AG); | [A]GB2034310 (SNIA VISCOSA); | [A]EP0026998 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 107, Nr. 11, 14. September 1987, Seite 654, Zusammenfassungsnr. 96332m, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. TOKITO "Preparation of alpha,omega-dialdehydes", & JP - A - 62 30734 (KURARAY) 09.02.1987, & JP6230734 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 85 (C-410)[2532], 14. März 1987; & JP - A - 61 238 751 (KURARAY) 24.10.1986, & JP61238751 A 00000000 |