|
16.09.1998 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1997 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.1997 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.1997 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1996 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1996 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.1996 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.1994 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1989 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
13.11.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1987 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |