EP0261667 - Plastic slides for microscopes and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomate Co., Ltd. Kagurazaka Masumoto Building 113, Yarai-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karasawa, Yoshiharu c/o Biomate Co. Ltd. 113, Yarai-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hirohashi, Ken c/o Biomate Co. Ltd. 113, Yarai-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113919.2 | 23.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | JP19860223862 | 24.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22386286 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261667 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261667 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261667 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/34 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
G02B21/34 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31533 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31536 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31971 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Kunststoff-Objektträger für Mikroskope und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/13] | English: | Plastic slides for microscopes and method of manufacturing same | [1988/13] | French: | Porte-objet plastique pour des microscopes et procédé de sa fabrication | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56050312 ; | [A]JP60111947 ; | [X]US3097070 (ADELBERT ALDRICH, et al); | [X]DE1472242 ; | [X]US4022521 (HALL RAYMOND V, et al); | [A]US4011350 (MARKOVITS ARTHUR L, et al); | [A]DE1252435 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 107 (P-70)(779), July 11, 1981; & JP-A-56 050 312 (MITSUBISHI RAYON) 07-05-1981, & JP56050312 A 00000000 | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS. vol 18, no. 11, June 1979, pages 1842-1846; J.D. LYTLE et al.: "Wideband optical transmission properties of seven thermoplastics" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPANvol. 9, no. 262 (P-398)(1985), October 19, 1985; & JP-A-60 111 947 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN) 18-06-1985, & JP60111947 A 00000000 |