EP0264914 - Process for producing L-phenylalanine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 1-6-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohte-Machi Itchome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsumata, Ryoichi CI-Heights H-801 1380, Yamazaki-machi Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ozaki, Akio 2-3-108, Kyowa-cho Hofu-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Masato 2-5-5, Futaba Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115350.8 | 20.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | JP19860250013 | 21.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25001386 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264914 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264914 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12P13/22, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:15, 1:13) | [1988/17] | CPC: |
C12P13/222 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C12N15/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Phenylalanin | [1988/17] | English: | Process for producing L-phenylalanine | [1988/17] | French: | Procédé de préparation de L-phénylalanine | [1988/17] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/26] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0190921 (ENGENICS INC [US]); | [AD]EP0183175 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [X]EP0176349 (BIOTEKNIKA INTERNATIONAL [US]); | [A]EP0137387 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [XD]EP0136359 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [XP]WO8700202 (NUTRASWEET CO [US]) | [A] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 49, no. 10, 1985, pages 2925-2930; A. OZAKI et al.: "Cloning of the genes concerned in phenylalanine biosynthesis inin corynebacterium glutamicum and its application to breeding of a phenylalanine producing strain" |