EP0268235 - Exterior water-proof ornamental sheet and method of construction it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujiwara Chemical Co., Ltd. 94, Oshinden Toyo-City Ehime / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states Fujiwara Chemical Co., Ltd. 94, Oshinden Toyo-City Ehime / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takata, Shigeru 1-6, Akarigawa Toyo-City Ehime / JP | 02 /
Aono, Takeki 690, Takata Toyo-City Ehime / JP | 03 /
Fujieda, Gentaro 1232-11, Hojo Toyo-City Ehime / JP | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Lewald, Dietrich Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner Belgradstrasse 1 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/33] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 W-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1988/21] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 6 Postfach 26 02 47 D-80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116815.9 | 13.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870272646 | 15.11.1986 Original published format: JP 27264687 | [1988/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0268235 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0268235 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268235 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/18, B32B5/00 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
B44C1/105 (EP,US);
D06N7/00 (EP,US);
D06N7/0028 (EP,US);
E04F13/0871 (EP,US);
E04F13/18 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US);
Y10T442/696 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/21] | Title | German: | Wasserdichte, dekorative Aussenplatte | [1988/21] | English: | Exterior water-proof ornamental sheet and method of construction it | [1988/21] | French: | Feuille imperméable décorative extérieure et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/21] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2231516 (HUMBERT ANDRE [FR]); | [X]GB453648 (GEORGE CRAWFORD TYCE, et al); | [X]US4083744 (DEGENS ALFREDO); | [A]DE1921008 (FORMICA CORP) |