EP0271028 - A memory capacity detecting device for memory cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushita, Tsuyoshi 99 Chujo Nirayama-cho Tagata-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117987.5 | 04.12.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | JP19860290807 | 06.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29080786 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271028 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271028 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/06 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
G06F12/0684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/24] | Title | German: | Eine Speicherkapazität-Erkennungsvorrichtung für Speicherkarten | [1988/24] | English: | A memory capacity detecting device for memory cards | [1988/24] | French: | Un dispositif détectant la capacité de mémoire pour des cartes à mémoire | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/37] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0136178 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC [US]); | [A]GB2175716 (MITEL CORP); | [A]EP0193306 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 12, May 1973, page 3796, New York, US; K. FRITSCH et al.: "Availability of additional storage capacity" |