EP0289662 - Vertical rotary braider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNATECH INTERNATIONAL, INC. a Pennsylvania corporation 1015 Penn Avenue Wyomissing Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states MAGNATECH INTERNATIONAL, INC. a Pennsylvania corporation 1015 Penn Avenue Wyomissing Pennsylvania / US | ||
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graeff, Barry L. 315 Ernst Road Greenfield Reading Pennsylvania 19601 / US | 02 /
Haehnel, Rudolf H. Cedar Top Road R.D. 1 Reading Pennsylvania 19607 / US | 03 /
Iannucci, Vincent A. 502 Dorchester Avenue Lincoln Park Westlawn Pennsylvania 19609 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/45] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118918.9 | 21.12.1987 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870045113 | 04.05.1987 Original published format: US 45113 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0289662 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0289662 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D04C3/42 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
D04C3/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/45] | Title | German: | Rotationsmaschine zum Senkrecht-Flechten | [1988/45] | English: | Vertical rotary braider | [1988/45] | French: | Machine rotative à tresser verticalement | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE320865 (EUGEN SICHTERMANN); | [AD]US2464899 (SOKOL VINCENT G); | [AD]US3892161 (SOKOL VINCENT); | [A]FR2426758 (COMAT SPA [IT]); | [A]US4535674 (BULL JEFFREY F [US], et al) |