EP0273443 - Liquid-crystal display devices of twisted nematic type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozaki, Shyuichi 2-51-303, Ukyo Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ichimura, Yukiko 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Narutaki, Yozo 202-298, Gojyo-cho Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119317.3 | 29.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860312753 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31275386 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273443 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273443 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, C09K19/42 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
C09K19/0208 (EP,US);
C09K19/3458 (EP,US);
C09K19/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/27] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Anzeigen vom verdreht-nematischen Typ | [1988/27] | English: | Liquid-crystal display devices of twisted nematic type | [1988/27] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides du type nématique en hélice | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0234892 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]); | EP0137210 [ ] (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | DE3423993 [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | EP0155033 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | US4364838 [ ] (BOLLER ARTHUR, et al) | [ ] - Sid, Digest of Technical Papers, May 1985, New York T.J. SCHEFFER et al.; "24 x 80 Character LCD Panel using the Supertwisted Birefringence Effect" pages 120-123 * totality * |