EP0231050 - Unstable laser resonator with output coupler having radially variable reflectivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE DELLE RICERCHE Piazzale Aldo Moro, 7 I-00198 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Silvestri, Sandro Via Val di Sole, 9 I-20141 Milano / IT | 02 /
Laporta, Paolo Via V. Gramsci, 16 I-20060 Cassina de' Pecchi Milano / IT | 03 /
Svelto, Orazio Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 8 I-20090 Segrate Milano / IT | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Marchi, Massimo c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87200120.1 | 27.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | IT19860019223 | 29.01.1986 Original published format: IT 1922386 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231050 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231050 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231050 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/081 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
H01S3/08081 (EP,US);
H01S3/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/32] | H01S3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Instabiler Laserresonator mit radial variabel reflektiver Auskoppelvorrichtung | [1987/32] | English: | Unstable laser resonator with output coupler having radially variable reflectivity | [1987/32] | French: | Résonateur laser instable muni d'un coupleur de sortie ayant une réflectivité variable radialement | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.1992 | BE | 16.09.1992 | CH | 16.09.1992 | LI | 16.09.1992 | NL | 16.09.1992 | SE | 16.09.1992 | LU | 31.01.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 16.09.1992 | |
BE | 16.09.1992 | ||
CH | 16.09.1992 | ||
LI | 16.09.1992 | ||
NL | 16.09.1992 | ||
SE | 16.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 16.09.1992 | |
CH | 16.09.1992 | ||
LI | 16.09.1992 | ||
NL | 16.09.1992 | ||
SE | 16.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | CH | 16.09.1992 | |
LI | 16.09.1992 | ||
NL | 16.09.1992 | ||
SE | 16.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | CH | 16.09.1992 | |
LI | 16.09.1992 | ||
NL | 16.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 16.09.1992 | |
LI | 16.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4360925 (BROSNAN STEPHEN J, et al) | [A] - OPTICS LETTERS, vol. 10, no. 11, November 1985, pages 553-555, Optical Society of America, New York, US; N. McCARTHY et al.: "Large-size Gaussian mode in unstable resonators using Gaussian mirrors" | [A] - OPTICS LETTERS, vol. 5, no. 11, November 1980, pages 491-493, Optical Society of America, US; G. GIULIANI et al.: "Radial birefringent element and its application to laser resonator design" |