EP0273476 - Image projection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spruit, Johannes Hendrikus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Cobben, Louis Marie Hubert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Cobben, Louis Marie Hubert, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202255.3 | 18.11.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | NL19860002975 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: NL 8602975 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273476 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273476 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/16, G02B5/28, G02B13/18, H04N9/31 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
G02B5/285 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (KR);
G02B13/16 (EP,US);
G02B13/18 (EP,US);
H04N9/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Bildprojektionssystem | [1988/27] | English: | Image projection system | [1988/27] | French: | Système de projection d'image | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 23.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.1993 | NL | 19.05.1993 | SE | 19.05.1993 | [1994/25] |
Former [1994/02] | NL | 19.05.1993 | |
SE | 19.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 19.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59102202 ; | [A]JP60143312 ; | [A]FR2256421 (SOPELEM [FR]); | [Y]US4526442 (BETENSKY ELLIS I [US]); | [A]US4564269 (UEHARA MAKOTO [JP]); | [YD]EP0170320 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 219 (P-306)[1656]page 103 P 306; & JP-A-59 102 202 (HIROSHI MITO) 13-06-1984, & JP59102202 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 312 (P-411)[2035]page 164 P 411; & JP-A-60 143 312 (NORITA KOUGAKU K.K.) 29-07-1985, & JP60143312 A 00000000 |