EP0240207 - Fluid-administration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarke, Ellis Whiteside 47 Deramore Drive Belfast BT9 5JS / GB | [1987/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/13] |
Former [1987/41] | Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87302358.4 | 19.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | GB19860007004 | 20.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8607004 | GB19860012076 | 19.05.1986 Original published format: GB 8612076 | GB19860012175 | 20.05.1986 Original published format: GB 8612175 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240207 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240207 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/16881 (EP,US);
A61M5/1411 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7879 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/41] | A61M5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | System zur Flüssigkeitsabgabe | [1987/41] | English: | Fluid-administration system | [1987/41] | French: | Système d'administration d'un fluide | [1987/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 07.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/21] | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/21] | Request for further processing for: | 07.06.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.1993 | 31.03.1994 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2346762 (LEER KONINKLIJKE EMBALLAGE [NL]); | [X]US4103686 (LEFEVRE ROBERT J); | [AD]GB2012393 (SIS TER SPA); | [A]US4186740 (GUERRA ROMEO E [US]); | [AD]EP0034671 (UNIV EXETER [GB]); | [X]WO8404460 (HEALTH CARE CONCEPTS INC [US]); | [XP]US4613325 (ABRAMS LAWRENCE M [US]) |