|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
13.05.1997 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.12.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.08.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.01.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
02.08.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1990 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1989 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1989 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1989 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.07.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1989 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.1987 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |